Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Owens, Marvin Jr, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Vannatta, Robert Timothy, against Rhodes, Zofia Zak, represented by Gubernat, Jesse, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGENTILE, GEOFFREY H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedMarch 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO NONBINDING ARBITRATION
Date: September 08, 2023REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF
Date: August 11, 2023PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023021752
Date: April 06, 2023REQUEST TO PRODUCE - PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, ZOFIA ZAK RHODES
Date: September 26, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 20, 2023REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, ZOFIA ZAK RHODES
Date: September 26, 2023STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: March 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - ZOFIA ZAK RHODES 07/12/23
Date: July 28, 2023REQUEST FOR COPIES - PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: January 05, 2024NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINITFF
Date: August 11, 2023CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER
Date: September 08, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT
Date: June 29, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING - 03/21/2024 @ 01:30 PM
Date: March 19, 2024RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: September 28, 2023NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES & TIME
Date: December 27, 2023DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: August 11, 2023ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANT
Date: July 07, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST ZOFIA ZAK RHODES
Date: April 06, 2023RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: September 28, 2023MOTION - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: March 07, 2024PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023018668
Date: March 20, 2023COURT MINUTES
Date: March 21, 2024COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: March 20, 20239/28/2023
Date: April 05, 20249/28/2023
Date: April 02, 20249/28/2023
Date: April 01, 20249/26/2023
Date: April 03, 20249/26/2023
Date: April 11, 20249/26/2023
Date: April 02, 20249/8/2023
Date: April 03, 20248/11/2023
Date: April 01, 20247/28/2023
Date: April 02, 20248/11/2023
Date: April 04, 20248/29/2023
Date: April 03, 20246/29/2023
Date: April 07, 20248/11/2023
Date: April 05, 20248/1/2023
Date: April 01, 20244/6/2023
Date: April 03, 20243/20/2023
Date: April 02, 20247/7/2023
Date: April 01, 20244/6/2023
Date: April 01, 20243/20/2023
Date: April 01, 20243/20/2023
Date: April 03, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.