Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mcdowall, Stephanie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cherichello, Thomas James, against Tedesco, Jimmy, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 18, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023018572
Date: March 20, 2023SUMMONS CANNOT ISSUE
Date: March 18, 2023LETTER FROM CLERK TO ATTORNEY
Date: March 20, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST JIMMY TEDESCO
Date: March 20, 2023PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, JIMMY TEDESCO
Date: March 18, 2023PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT, JIMMY TEDESCO
Date: March 18, 2023NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR RECEIPT OF SERVICE
Date: March 18, 2023NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFFS FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFNEDANT, JIMMY TEDESCO
Date: March 18, 2023COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: March 18, 2023STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: March 18, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 18, 20234/29/2023
Date: May 02, 20244/28/2023
Date: May 02, 20245/1/2023
Date: May 02, 20243/20/2023
Date: May 01, 20243/20/2023
Date: May 02, 20243/18/2023
Date: May 04, 20243/18/2023
Date: May 02, 20243/18/2023
Date: May 03, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023018572 | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CLERK TO ATTORNEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.