Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jeannis, Roodler, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Sampas, Jonathan George, against Holmes, Christian, Southwest Waste Services Llc, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 18, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023018560
Date: March 20, 2023STANDING ORDER IN CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES IN THE TWENTIETH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT
Date: March 18, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 18, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 18, 20236/14/2023
Date: December 01, 20233/18/2023
Date: December 02, 20236/12/2023
Date: December 01, 20233/20/2023
Date: December 01, 20233/18/2023
Date: December 04, 20233/18/2023
Date: December 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023018560 | |
March 18, 2023 | Docket Event | STANDING ORDER IN CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES IN THE TWENTIETH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT | |
March 18, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
March 18, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.