Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Caseau, Jacquelyn, Caseau, Scott, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kassel, Matthew, against First Protective Insurance Company D B A Frontline, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 01, 131 |
CategoryContracts |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023018467
Date: March 17, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 17, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 17, 2023STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: March 17, 2023PLAINTIFFS’FIRST REQUESTSFOR ADMISSION TO DEFENDANT
Date: March 17, 2023PLAINTIFFS’FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT
Date: March 17, 2023PLAINTIFFS’NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OFINTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT
Date: March 17, 20237/28/2023
Date: May 02, 20243/23/2023
Date: May 01, 20244/11/2023
Date: May 03, 20246/9/2023
Date: May 18, 20245/5/2023
Date: May 07, 20243/17/2023
Date: May 01, 20243/17/2023
Date: May 05, 20243/17/2023
Date: May 09, 20243/17/2023
Date: May 02, 20243/17/2023
Date: May 03, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.