Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Td Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Lavrar, Flynn, against Harriott, Michael C, represented by Dunn, Leslie Lunsford, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with BELL, PETER A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 09, 2023 |
CategoryMatters Involving Claims 2,501 - 8,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
NON-SERVICE RETURN0 UNEXECUTED 04/11/2023- MICHAEL C HARRIOTT
Date: April 12, 2023PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023017348
Date: March 09, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL C HARRIOTT
Date: March 09, 2023NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY
Date: March 09, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 09, 2023NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING
Date: March 09, 2023SUMMONS REQUEST
Date: March 09, 2023STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: March 09, 20234/12/2023
Date: May 04, 20243/9/2023
Date: May 03, 20244/24/2023
Date: May 01, 20244/24/2023
Date: May 05, 20244/24/2023
Date: May 03, 20246/5/2023
Date: May 02, 20243/9/2023
Date: May 01, 20243/9/2023
Date: May 05, 20248/9/2023
Date: May 01, 20248/10/2023
Date: May 01, 20245/13/2023
Date: May 04, 20248/8/2023
Date: May 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.