Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Gonsalves, Craig, Johnson, Maura, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Breen, Natalie, Sullivan, Vincent, Vigliotti, Jeanette, Vigliotti, Nicolas, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2022 |
CategoryPartition < $50K |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
12/13/2022
Date: May 02, 20247/25/2023
Date: May 01, 20245/1/2023
Date: May 03, 202412/13/2022
Date: May 03, 20247/24/2023
Date: May 01, 202412/13/2022
Date: May 01, 202412/13/2022
Date: May 23, 20241/23/2023
Date: May 01, 20242/15/2023
Date: May 02, 20242/9/2023
Date: May 04, 20241/20/2023
Date: May 03, 20241/23/2023
Date: May 02, 20242/9/2023
Date: May 03, 2024PAYMENT $450.00 RECEIPT #2023007222
Date: December 13, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST JEANETTE VIGLIOTTI
Date: December 13, 2022VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: December 13, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: December 13, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST CRAIG GONSALVES
Date: December 13, 2022STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: December 13, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.