Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Gyurko, Attila, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Horvath, Maria K, Suncoast Rental Services, Llc, A Florida Limited L, represented by Oliver, David T, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 19, 2022 |
CategoryPartition > $50K < $250K |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
1/25/2023
Date: May 04, 202410/19/2022
Date: May 02, 20243/7/2023
Date: May 01, 202410/19/2022
Date: May 01, 20243/1/2023
Date: May 01, 202410/19/2022
Date: May 09, 202412/13/2022
Date: May 02, 20241/27/2023
Date: May 01, 20241/12/2023
Date: May 03, 20241/17/2023
Date: May 01, 202412/12/2022
Date: May 03, 202412/13/2022
Date: May 03, 20242/27/2023
Date: May 04, 202411/17/2022
Date: May 01, 202410/19/2022
Date: May 03, 20241/9/2023
Date: May 03, 20242/24/2023
Date: May 05, 202412/12/2022
Date: May 04, 20241/24/2023
Date: May 03, 20241/27/2023
Date: May 04, 20241/27/2023
Date: May 05, 202411/8/2022
Date: May 02, 202410/21/2022
Date: May 02, 20241/6/2023
Date: May 04, 202411/9/2022
Date: May 03, 20243/8/2023
Date: May 07, 20241/6/2023
Date: May 01, 202411/2/2022
Date: May 01, 202410/21/2022
Date: May 01, 202412/22/2022
Date: May 01, 202410/19/2022
Date: May 01, 2066NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (O.5059.51. / 3160226)
Date: October 19, 2022PAYMENT $952.00 RECEIPT #2023001579
Date: October 19, 2022VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: October 19, 2022STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: October 19, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: October 19, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST SUNCOAST RENTAL SERVICES LLC
Date: October 19, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: October 19, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: October 19, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (O.5059.115. / 3160268)
Date: October 19, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (O.5059.126. / 3160278)
Date: October 19, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (O.5059.113. / 3160266)
Date: October 19, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (O.5059.108. / 3160261)
Date: October 19, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (O.5059.102. / 3160257)
Date: October 19, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (O.5059.86. / 3160250)
Date: October 19, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (O.5059.67. / 3160241)
Date: October 19, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (O.5059.76. / 3160246)
Date: October 19, 2022MOTION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION
Date: October 19, 2022MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL MAGISTRATE TO SELL PROPERTY
Date: October 19, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516
Date: November 02, 2022PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023001859
Date: October 21, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED -MARIA HORVATH
Date: October 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2066 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2035 | Docket Event | ||
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.