Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cupp, Scott H filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Reyes, Ignacio A, represented by Kaplan, G Harris, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with CUPP, SCOTT H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED
Date: August 28, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: September 02, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE AMENDED
Date: September 02, 2021BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: August 27, 2021RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: August 28, 2021INFORMATION AND NOTICE TO CLERK - EXPEDITED
Date: September 13, 2021BOOKING REPORT RELEASE
Date: September 13, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: September 14, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: August 27, 2021RETURNED MAIL
Date: September 21, 2021CASH APPEARANCE BOND
Date: September 13, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WVR OF ARRGN/WRTTN PLEA/DMD DISC
Date: September 01, 2021BOOKING REPORT FILED - COLLIER CO.
Date: November 15, 2021RETURNED MAIL
Date: December 22, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE AMENDED
Date: December 13, 2021CASH APPEARANCE BOND
Date: October 01, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE - FTA- BENCH WARRANT ISSUED - NO BOND EST - NO BOND HOLD
Date: September 21, 2021BENCH WARRANT ISSUED
Date: September 24, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: December 08, 2021RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING - COLLIER CO.
Date: November 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: January 21, 2022BENCH WARRANT SERVED
Date: January 21, 2022ORDER TO TRANSPORT
Date: January 19, 2022RETURNED MAIL
Date: January 03, 2022APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS - PD APPT'D
Date: January 22, 2022CASH BOND 202104758 POSTED $500.00
Date: January 01, 1CASH BOND 202104758 POSTED $2,000.00
Date: January 01, 1ARREST WARRANT REVIEW CHECKLIST
Date: October 12, 2021RETURNED MAIL
Date: December 16, 2021ORDER TO TRANSPORT
Date: December 27, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE ERC HEARING 1/25 @ 8:30
Date: December 27, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: December 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2022 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS - PD APPT'D | |
January 22, 2022 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL FIRST APPEARANCE SET FOR 01/22/2022 AT 8:30 AM IN 4TH/ , JDG: GENTILE, GEOFFREY H | |
January 22, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR COURT APPOINTED INTERPRETER | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | BENCH WARRANT SERVED | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | JESSICA LUNSFORD CERTIFICATE | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | BOOKING REPORT FILED | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | HABITUAL FELONY OFFENDER STATUS | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO TRANSPORT | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.