Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bell, Peter A filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Williams, Keshaun Michael, represented by Lewis, Amaris A, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with BELL, PETER A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY
Date: September 23, 2021INFORMATION AND NOTICE TO CLERK
Date: September 20, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE AMENDED
Date: September 09, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WVR OF ARRGN/WRTTN PLEA/DMD DISC
Date: September 09, 2021RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: September 04, 2021AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED
Date: September 04, 2021SURETY APPEARANCE BOND
Date: September 07, 2021BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: September 04, 2021BOOKING REPORT RELEASE
Date: September 07, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE AMENDED
Date: October 04, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE P&S 11/5 @ 8:30
Date: September 22, 2021ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL
Date: September 30, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WVR OF ARRGN/WRTTN PLEA/DMD DISC
Date: October 04, 2021CERTIFICATE OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST
Date: September 28, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: September 24, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE P&S 12/3 @ 8:30
Date: November 05, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: November 08, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE P/S 1/6 @ 1:30
Date: December 03, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: December 03, 2021RETURNED MAIL
Date: November 24, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: November 10, 20218/25/2022
Date: May 01, 20248/24/2022
Date: May 02, 20248/24/2022
Date: May 01, 20248/11/2022
Date: May 01, 20248/1/2022
Date: May 02, 20247/30/2022
Date: May 01, 20248/11/2022
Date: May 02, 20248/2/2022
Date: May 02, 20247/29/2022
Date: May 03, 20247/22/2022
Date: May 01, 20243/7/2022
Date: May 02, 20242/28/2022
Date: May 02, 20242/11/2022
Date: May 01, 20247/22/2022
Date: May 02, 20242/4/2022
Date: May 01, 20242/3/2022
Date: May 02, 20241/6/2022
Date: May 01, 20242/3/2022
Date: May 01, 20241/10/2022
Date: May 01, 202411/24/2021
Date: May 02, 202412/3/2021
Date: May 01, 202411/5/2021
Date: May 01, 202411/8/2021
Date: May 01, 202410/4/2021
Date: May 01, 202411/10/2021
Date: May 01, 20249/30/2021
Date: May 01, 20249/24/2021
Date: May 01, 20249/28/2021
Date: May 01, 20249/20/2021
Date: May 03, 20249/22/2021
Date: May 01, 20249/9/2021
Date: May 01, 20249/23/2021
Date: May 01, 20249/4/2021
Date: May 01, 20241/1/0001
Date: May 01, 20249/7/2021
Date: May 02, 20249/4/2021
Date: May 02, 20249/4/2021
Date: May 03, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.