Case Last Refreshed: 3 days ago
Powell Link Llc, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case against Louden, Suzanne, Myakka Properties Llc, represented by Reissman, Marshall G, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 07, 2021 |
CategoryQuiet Title < $50K |
Last RefreshedApril 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is a quiet title action filed by Powell-Link, LLC against Myakka Properties, LLC and Suzanne Louden. Powell-Link, LLC claims to be the true owner of a property located in Charlotte County, Florida. They allege that their signature was ...
SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED - SUZANNE LOUDEN - OCTOBER 08, 2021
Date: October 07, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE - SUZANNE LOUDEN - MAY 03, 2022
Date: May 09, 2022COURT MINUTES
Date: September 02, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: October 19, 2022COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE
Date: October 07, 2021NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (O.4855.808. / 3007434)
Date: October 08, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING - 10/17/2022 @ 09:00 AM
Date: September 14, 2022VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: October 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE
Date: May 24, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FILED BY REISSMAN LAW GROUP
Date: November 04, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: October 07, 2021PAYMENT $425.00 RECEIPT #2022000931
Date: October 08, 2021MOTION - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RENEW LIS PENDENS
Date: September 14, 2022STANDING ORDER IN CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES IN THE TWENTIETH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT
Date: October 07, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE - MYAKKA PROPERTIES LLC - MAY 03, 2022
Date: May 09, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING - 11/08/2022 @ 09:30 AM
Date: October 21, 2022MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL
Date: June 30, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: May 24, 2022ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR SERVICE UPON DEFENDANTS
Date: January 13, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING - 09/02/2022 @ 02:30 PM
Date: July 13, 2022DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE
Date: November 21, 2022SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED - MYAKKA PROPERTIES LLC - OCTOBER 08, 2021
Date: October 07, 2021MOTION - DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SET ASIDE CLERKS DEFAULT
Date: May 26, 2022MOTION FOR EXTENSION - POWELL-LINK, LLC
Date: January 11, 2022COURT MINUTES
Date: November 08, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: October 07, 2021COURT MINUTES
Date: October 17, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: October 19, 2022DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE - RECORDED (OTHER.0.0. / 3175433)
Date: November 22, 202210/19/2022
Date: May 11, 202410/7/2021
Date: May 02, 20241/11/2022
Date: May 02, 20249/2/2022
Date: May 01, 20245/26/2022
Date: May 06, 202410/17/2022
Date: May 01, 202410/21/2022
Date: May 02, 202410/7/2021
Date: May 03, 20245/24/2022
Date: May 06, 202411/4/2022
Date: May 02, 20249/14/2022
Date: May 03, 20246/30/2022
Date: May 02, 20245/9/2022
Date: May 03, 20245/24/2022
Date: May 01, 202410/19/2022
Date: May 01, 20241/13/2022
Date: May 01, 202411/21/2022
Date: May 02, 202410/7/2021
Date: May 01, 202411/8/2022
Date: May 01, 202410/18/2022
Date: May 01, 202411/4/2022
Date: May 03, 20249/14/2022
Date: May 02, 202410/7/2021
Date: May 11, 202410/8/2021
Date: May 01, 20249/8/2022
Date: May 02, 20245/24/2022
Date: May 02, 202411/22/2022
Date: May 02, 20247/13/2022
Date: May 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.