Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Burns, John L filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Francis, Jason Allen, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with BURNS, JOHN L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 15, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
WAIVER OF APPEARANCE
Date: August 31, 2021CITATION (TICKET)
Date: August 31, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE AMENDED
Date: August 31, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WRTTN PLEA/DMD JURY TRL
Date: August 31, 2021DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY
Date: August 31, 2021CITATION COPY
Date: August 31, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE CMC 9/27 @ 9AM
Date: September 01, 2021CITATION (TICKET)
Date: August 20, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: September 03, 202112/8/2021
Date: May 01, 202411/18/2021
Date: May 02, 202411/19/2021
Date: May 01, 20249/29/2021
Date: May 01, 202410/22/2021
Date: May 01, 20249/3/2021
Date: May 01, 20249/27/2021
Date: May 01, 202410/11/2021
Date: May 03, 202410/14/2021
Date: May 01, 20249/1/2021
Date: May 01, 20248/31/2021
Date: May 01, 20248/31/2021
Date: May 02, 20248/20/2021
Date: May 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.