Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Barnett, Jennifer filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Bosnak, Nicholas Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with MASON, DONALD H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMASON, DONALD H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: June 03, 2021RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: June 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: June 03, 2021BOOKING REPORT RELEASE
Date: June 04, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE ERC 7/22 @ 9AM - LAST CONTINUANCE
Date: June 28, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE PLEA ENTERED
Date: July 22, 2021SENTENCE FORM
Date: July 22, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: June 30, 2021INFORMATION AND NOTICE TO CLERK - EXPEDITED
Date: June 16, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WVR OF ARRGN/WRTTN PLEA/DMD DISC
Date: June 04, 2021SURETY BOND PC701468248 POSTED $500.00
Date: June 04, 2021SURETY BOND PC701468249 POSTED $2,000.00
Date: June 04, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: June 18, 2021FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT
Date: July 22, 20219/9/2021
Date: April 01, 20247/30/2021
Date: April 01, 20249/8/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/30/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/28/2021
Date: April 01, 20247/29/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/16/2021
Date: April 04, 20247/22/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/18/2021
Date: April 01, 20247/22/2021
Date: April 02, 20246/4/2021
Date: April 02, 20246/3/2021
Date: April 02, 20246/4/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/3/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/3/2021
Date: April 04, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.