Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cupp, Scott H filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Raimer, James Joseph Jr, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with CUPP, SCOTT H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCUPP, SCOTT H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 29, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
DECLINE PUBLIC DEFENDER SERVICES - MOVED
Date: May 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: May 29, 2021ORDER GRANTING INDIGENCY
Date: May 29, 20212/7/2023
Date: April 01, 20246/1/2021
Date: April 01, 20245/30/2021
Date: April 01, 20247/1/2021
Date: April 01, 20245/30/2021
Date: April 02, 20245/29/2021
Date: April 01, 20245/29/2021
Date: April 02, 20245/29/2021
Date: April 04, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL FIRST APPEARANCE SET FOR 05/30/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 3RD/ , JDG: BURNS, JOHN L | |
May 29, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLINE PUBLIC DEFENDER SERVICES - MOVED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.