Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Conover, Jessica, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Tomasi, Paul A, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 12, 2021 |
CategoryPartition > $50K < $250K |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Circuit Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit in Charlotte County, Florida. The plaintiff, Jessica Conover, is suing the defendant, Paul A. Tomasi, for partition of real property. The property in ques...
COMPLAINT FOR PARTITION OF REAL PROPERTY
Date: July 12, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST PAUL TOMASI
Date: July 12, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: July 12, 2021STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: July 12, 2021VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: July 12, 2021PAYMENT $915.00 RECEIPT #2021032723
Date: July 13, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON JULY 15, 2021 SERVED PAUL A. TOMASI OWN R. YOUNGBLOOD
Date: July 20, 2021MOTION - MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL MASTER
Date: August 05, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING - 09/02/2021 @ 10:30 AM
Date: August 12, 2021MOTION TO STRIKE - MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER
Date: August 03, 2021NOTICE OF FILING
Date: September 09, 2021ANSWER
Date: September 10, 2021STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITIUTION OF SPECIAL MAGISTRATE
Date: February 21, 2022ORDER ON MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER
Date: September 10, 2021ORDER ON MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL MAGISTRATE
Date: September 10, 20215/12/2022
Date: May 03, 20249/10/2021
Date: May 02, 20249/9/2021
Date: May 03, 20249/10/2021
Date: May 01, 20247/13/2021
Date: May 01, 20247/12/2021
Date: May 02, 20248/5/2021
Date: May 02, 20247/18/2022
Date: May 08, 20247/20/2021
Date: May 03, 20247/12/2021
Date: May 03, 20248/3/2021
Date: May 04, 20249/2/2021
Date: May 01, 20245/24/2022
Date: May 03, 20242/25/2022
Date: May 02, 20248/12/2021
Date: May 03, 20245/16/2022
Date: May 01, 20247/26/2022
Date: May 01, 20242/21/2022
Date: May 01, 20245/17/2022
Date: May 01, 2024ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF SPECIAL MAGISTRATE
Date: February 25, 2022COURT MINUTES
Date: September 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.