Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Nexovant Properties Llc A Florida Limited Liability Company, Trustee 4722 S Fairway Dr Land Trust Dated August 24 2020, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hall, Terry Trevor, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 10, 2021 |
CategoryPartition < $50K |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
COMPLAINT FOR PARTITION
Date: March 10, 2021VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: March 10, 2021DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR PARTITION OF REAL PROPERTY
Date: August 02, 2021COURT MINUTES
Date: June 22, 2021DEFAULT GRANTED AGAINST TERRY TREVOR HALL - FAILURE TO RESPOND
Date: May 21, 2021DEFAULT DENIED AGAINST TERRY TREVOR HALL - PREVIOUSLY GRANTED ON 5/21
Date: June 02, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 10, 2021PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021018503
Date: March 12, 2021STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES IN CHARLOTTE COUNTY
Date: March 10, 2021PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021021527
Date: April 06, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST TERRY TREVOR HALL
Date: March 22, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT - TERRY TREVOR HALL
Date: May 19, 2021NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: May 19, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT - TERRY TREVOR HALL
Date: May 24, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING - 06/22/2021 @ 09:30 AM
Date: May 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR PARTITION OF REAL PROPERTY - RECORDED (O.4816.1807. / 2980099) | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR PARTITION OF REAL PROPERTY | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFAULT DENIED AGAINST TERRY TREVOR HALL - PREVIOUSLY GRANTED ON 5/21 | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING - 06/22/2021 @ 09:30 AM | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT - TERRY TREVOR HALL | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFAULT GRANTED AGAINST TERRY TREVOR HALL - FAILURE TO RESPOND | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT - TERRY TREVOR HALL | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021021527 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.