Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Burns, John L filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Ortiz, Yvonne, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with BURNS, JOHN L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
CITATION COPY
Date: December 03, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: December 07, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: December 09, 2020CITATION (TICKET)
Date: December 01, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: December 01, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | TRAFFIC ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 01/11/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN VIA ZOOM CONFERENCE/ , JDG: BURNS, JOHN L | |
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: REYNOLDS, JEFFREY N ASSIGNED | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | CITATION COPY | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | CITATION (TICKET) | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 12/01/2020 CASE NUMBER 20008270TR | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | SPEEDING VIOLATIONS ASSESSED $353.00 DUE ON 12/31/2020 | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | SEQ: 1 - (316.187 2A) SPEEDING 70 INTERSTATE - REQUIRES SPEEDS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.