Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Burns, John L filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Torres, Orlando, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with BURNS, JOHN L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
CITATION (TICKET)
Date: September 30, 2020SUBPOENA ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: November 18, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: November 18, 2020SENTENCE FORM CONT'D 12/10 @10AM
Date: November 16, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: September 30, 2020CITATION COPY
Date: October 27, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA ISSUED BY CLERK | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | TRAFFIC TRIAL FHP SET FOR 12/10/2020 AT 10:00 AM IN VIA ZOOM CONFERENCE/ , JDG: BURNS, JOHN L | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | SENTENCE FORM CONT'D 12/10 @10AM | |
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | CITATION COPY | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | CITATION (TICKET) | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 09/30/2020 CASE NUMBER 20006593TR | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | MANDATORY COURT $353 105/70 | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : WAITING FOR PAYMENT REQUIRED BY: 10/28/2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.