Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Scherr, Harold Earl, against Washington, Ashley, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with BELL, PETER A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2020 |
CategoryMatters Involving Claims 2,501 - 8,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
RETURN OF SERVICE ASHLEY WASHINGTON 1/6/2021
Date: January 08, 2021MOTION TO ADOPT STIPULATION AND DISMISS
Date: January 21, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED - MARCH 23, 2021 9:00 - ZOOM INFORMATION ATTACHED
Date: December 16, 2020COURT MINUTES
Date: March 23, 2021STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: December 16, 2020SUMMONS REQUEST
Date: December 16, 2020STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: December 16, 2020CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 16, 2020PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021007880
Date: December 16, 20203/23/2021
Date: May 01, 20241/21/2021
Date: May 05, 20241/8/2021
Date: May 04, 202412/16/2020
Date: May 02, 202412/16/2020
Date: May 24, 202412/16/2020
Date: May 01, 202412/16/2020
Date: May 03, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ADOPT STIPULATION AND DISMISS | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ASHLEY WASHINGTON 1/6/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.