Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Port Charlotte Hma Llc Dba Peace River Regional Medical Center Assignee Of Ricky Robillard, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Oleson, Jay E, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with BELL, PETER A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2020 |
CategoryClaims More Than $500 But Less Than $2,500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
SUMMONS REQUEST
Date: December 15, 2020STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: December 15, 2020FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED (O.4735.786. / 2922636)
Date: March 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS
Date: March 18, 2021FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: March 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS
Date: March 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE
Date: March 18, 2021COURT MINUTES
Date: March 10, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 15, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED - JAY OLESON - MARCH 10, 2021 9:00 - ZOOM INFORMATION ATTACHED
Date: December 16, 2020PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021007804
Date: December 16, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED (O.4735.786. / 2922636) | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE | |
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED SUBSTITUTE - JAY E OLESON - TO MRS. OLESON (SPOUSE) - 1/12/2021 @ 1:09PM | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED - JAY OLESON - MARCH 10, 2021 9:00 - ZOOM INFORMATION ATTACHED | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 12/16/2020 CASE NUMBER 20001921SP | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021007804 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.