Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bray, Victoria A filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against King, James Sidney Jr, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with BURNS, JOHN L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBURNS, JOHN L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: December 19, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: December 19, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | PROSECUTOR: BRAY, VICTORIA A ASSIGNED | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | DROPPED/ABANDONED (NO FILE) SEQ: 1 SAME - (784.03 1A1) BATTERY TOUCH OR STRIKE 2560 | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | BOND DISCHARGE SLIP | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NO INFORMATION | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND AS15K315402 (784.03 1A1) RELEASED | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 01/20/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 3RD/ , JDG: BURNS, JOHN L | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE - ARR CONT'D 1/20/21 | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 01/06/2021 AT 10:30 AM IN 3RD/ , JDG: BURNS, JOHN L | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NO CONTACT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.