Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Midfirst Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Scolaro, Andrew, Ullman, Zachary Y, against Evans, April M, Evans, Robert J, Unknown Tenant 1, Unknown Tenant 2, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2020 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure 50,001 - 250,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: December 15, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING - 06/30/2021 @ 09:00 AM
Date: June 10, 2021ORDER ON JUDICIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (JCMC)
Date: May 26, 2021PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2022001017
Date: October 08, 2021PROOF OF PUBLICATION - 09/24/2021, 10/01/2021
Date: October 01, 2021PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CANCEL OCTOBER 21, 2021 SALE
Date: October 14, 2021PROOF OF PUBLICATION - 07/30/2021, 08/06/2021
Date: August 11, 2021MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: August 20, 2021NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE - 10/21/21 - BUSINESS OBSERVER
Date: September 17, 2021EMAIL REQUEST AND REPLY FROM BUSINESS OBSERVER
Date: July 27, 2021NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE - 8/25/21 - BUSINESS OBSERVER
Date: July 21, 2021ORDER ON JUDICIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: June 30, 2021PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2022001952
Date: October 18, 2021PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2021037456
Date: August 24, 2021FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED (O.4801.140. / 2969511)
Date: July 09, 2021ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CANCEL OCTOBER 21, 2021 SALE
Date: October 14, 2021EMAIL REQUEST AND REPLY FROM BUSINESS OBSERVER
Date: September 22, 2021FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: July 08, 2021PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2021037432
Date: August 23, 2021PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2021037455
Date: August 24, 2021LETTER FROM CLERK TO ATTORNEY SCOLARO REGARDING FEES
Date: September 10, 2021CORRESPONDENCE SENT WITH FEE PAYMENT
Date: August 24, 2021MEMORANDUM
Date: October 19, 2021COURT MINUTES
Date: May 26, 2021COURT MINUTES
Date: June 30, 2021DEFAULT GRANTED AGAINST ROBERT J. EVANS AND APRIL M EVANS - FAILURE TO RESPOND
Date: February 08, 2021CLERKS MORTGAGE/NOTE WORKFLOW BATCH COVER SHEET
Date: March 03, 2021VERIFIED COMPAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE
Date: December 15, 2020CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 15, 2020STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: December 15, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNKNOWN TENANT #2
Date: December 15, 2020VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: December 15, 2020DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: December 15, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST UNKNOWN TENANT #1
Date: December 15, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST APRIL M. EVANS
Date: December 15, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST ROBERT J. EVANS
Date: December 15, 2020NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (O.4677.1794. / 2883465)
Date: December 16, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED - ROBERT J. EVANS 1/16/2021 SUBSTITUTE WAS APRIL EVANS
Date: January 19, 2021PAYMENT $950.00 RECEIPT #2021007777
Date: December 16, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED - APRIL EVANS 1/16/2021
Date: January 19, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED - UNKNOWN TENANT #1
Date: January 19, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: February 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE
Date: February 03, 2021NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT - UNKNOWN TENANT #1 AND UNKNOWN TENANT #2
Date: February 05, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED - UNKNOWN TENANT #2
Date: January 19, 2021MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS
Date: February 19, 2021NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS
Date: February 19, 2021NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING
Date: February 22, 2021NOTICE OF FILING THE ORIGINAL NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE
Date: February 22, 2021NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING
Date: February 25, 2021ORIGINAL MORTGAGE
Date: February 26, 2021NOTICE OF FILING THE ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE
Date: February 25, 2021ORIGINAL NOTE
Date: February 25, 2021NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS
Date: March 08, 2021ORDER SETTING FORECLOSURE JUDICIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2048 | Docket Event | ||
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.