Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Blake, Frank, filed a(n) Writ Of Mandamus case against Blevins, Douglas D, Charlotte County, represented by Cole, Tiernan, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 22, 2020 |
CategoryWrit Of Mandamus |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
|
This complaint is a petition for a Writ of Mandamus to enforce the public's right to inspect public records under the Florida Public Records Law. The petitioner, Frank Blake, is requesting that the respondents, Charlotte County and Douglas D. Blevins...
MOTION TO VACATE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 14, 2020NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE
Date: May 14, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED DOUGALS D BLEVINS 5/26/2020
Date: May 28, 2020CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 22, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 26, 2020ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT
Date: June 26, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED BILL TRUEX 5/27/2020
Date: May 28, 2020MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT
Date: June 18, 2020RESPONDENTS' MOTION TO VACATE CLERK'S DEFAULT
Date: June 19, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED - BILL TRUEX - 5/22/2020
Date: May 22, 2020ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 20, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM - 9/15/2020 @ 1:30PM
Date: September 04, 2020FINAL ORDER DENYING WRIT OF MANDAMUS
Date: October 01, 2020COURT MINUTES - WRIT OF MANDAMUS
Date: September 15, 2020PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: June 18, 2020NOTICE CANCELLING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: August 24, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED - DOUGLAS D. BLEVINS - 5/22/2020
Date: May 22, 2020PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS
Date: April 22, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 24, 2020PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2020026345
Date: May 22, 2020DEFAULT DENIED - CHARLOTTE COUNTY
Date: June 19, 2020PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020024031
Date: April 22, 2020DEFAULT GRANTED - CHARLOTTE COUNTY
Date: June 18, 202010/1/2020
Date: May 07, 20249/15/2020
Date: May 06, 20248/24/2020
Date: May 01, 20247/19/2020
Date: May 01, 20389/4/2020
Date: May 02, 20248/24/2020
Date: May 04, 20247/13/2020
Date: May 01, 20466/26/2020
Date: May 01, 20245/28/2020
Date: May 02, 20245/22/2020
Date: May 11, 20246/19/2020
Date: May 03, 20246/18/2020
Date: May 03, 20246/19/2020
Date: May 01, 20246/18/2020
Date: May 02, 20244/24/2020
Date: May 02, 20245/14/2020
Date: May 03, 20244/22/2020
Date: May 02, 20245/14/2020
Date: May 01, 20244/22/2020
Date: May 08, 20244/22/2020
Date: May 01, 20246/18/2020
Date: May 01, 20245/22/2020
Date: May 01, 20245/20/2020
Date: May 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2046 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2038 | Docket Event | ||
May 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.