Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Briggs-Seward, Shawn K. filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Freed, Charles David, Freed, Charles David Jr, represented by Lombardo, Joseph Jr, Mcdonald, Patrick W., in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with MASON, DONALD H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
This complaint is a petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed by Charles D. Freed, Jr. in the Circuit Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit in Charlotte County, Florida. Freed is currently incarcerated in the Charlotte County Jail and seeks transf...
ORDER OF NO CONTACT
Date: January 28, 2020SENTENCE FORM - CT1 &2 ADJ WITHHELD
Date: January 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: April 07, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WVR OF ARRGN/WRTTN PLEA
Date: April 07, 2021CASE CORRESPONDENCE FROM DOC WEBSITE
Date: April 07, 2021VIOLATION REPORT
Date: March 16, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE VOP 6/10 9AM
Date: May 06, 2021MOTION TO REDUCE, MODIFY, OR SET BOND
Date: May 25, 2021WAIVER OF APPEARANCE
Date: April 14, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE VOP HR 5/6 9AM
Date: April 12, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WVR OF ARRGN/WRTTN PLEA/DMD DISC
Date: April 14, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE AMENDED
Date: May 04, 2021ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL
Date: May 03, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE MOTION TO REDUCE BOND - DENIED
Date: May 26, 2021SENTENCE FORM A/G
Date: June 25, 2021ORDER OF MODIFICATION OF PROBATION
Date: July 14, 2021SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET
Date: June 25, 2021VIOLATION PLEA FORM
Date: June 29, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE DEF ENTER PLEA
Date: June 25, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: June 23, 2021REQUEST TO BE SENT/ARR DURING AUDIOVISUAL 1ST APP
Date: June 29, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: August 26, 2021EMERGENCY PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS
Date: August 19, 2021ORDER FILED OF REFERENCE REGARDING EX PARTE COMMUNICATION TO COURT
Date: August 26, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE VOP HR 7/15 @ 9AM
Date: June 10, 2021MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL
Date: April 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: January 28, 2020BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: January 28, 2020AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED
Date: January 28, 2020INFORMATION AND NOTICE TO CLERK - EXPEDITED
Date: February 14, 2020COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE CMC 04/08 @ 9AM
Date: March 02, 2020RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: January 28, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: March 26, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WVR OF ARRGN/WRTTN PLEA/DMD DISC
Date: February 10, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WVR OF ARRGN/WRTTN PLEA/DMD DISC
Date: March 26, 2020BOOKING REPORT RELEASE
Date: May 05, 2020NOTICE OF DISCOVERY
Date: April 15, 2020ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CMC 04/08 @ 9AM
Date: March 02, 2020SURETY BOND 05110615139 POSTED $15,000.00
Date: May 05, 2020CERTIFICATE OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST
Date: March 23, 2020ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL
Date: March 24, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: May 06, 2020RETURNED MAIL
Date: April 02, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: May 04, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: June 05, 2020PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER - PTC 8/25 @ 9AM
Date: July 21, 2020SURETY BOND 00610614998 POSTED $5,000.00
Date: May 05, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: July 22, 2020ARREST CARD - SARASOTA CO ADMIN HOLD FOR CHARLOTTE CO
Date: May 12, 2020CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER PTC 07/21 @ 9AM
Date: June 02, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: August 25, 2020PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER - TC 10/07 @ 9AM
Date: August 25, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FILED OF REFERENCE REGARDING EX PARTE COMMUNICATION TO COURT | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FILED OF REFERENCE REGARDING EX PARTE COMMUNICATION TO COURT | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL HEARING SET FOR 09/17/2021 AT 11:00 AM IN 4TH/ , JDG: MASON, DONALD H | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO TRANSFER PELTITIONER'S "PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS" TO CRIMINAL CASE | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | EMERGENCY PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR OTHER | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF MODIFICATION OF PROBATION | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | VIOLATION PLEA FORM | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO BE SENT/ARR DURING AUDIOVISUAL 1ST APP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.