Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Laposa, Debra, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Long, Ashley Marie, against Doe, John, Horvath, David F, Wal-Mart Stores East Lp, represented by Ross, Amanda J, Tanner, Madison, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 03, 202 |
CategoryPremises Liability - Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
MOTION IN LIMINE - CHARLOTTE COUNTY, FLORIDA DEFENDANTS OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: August 30, 2021COURT MINUTES
Date: September 03, 2021ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL/NON-JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - 11/01/2021 AT 9:15 AM
Date: August 23, 2021DEFENDANT'S AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - 9/2/2021 @ 1:30PM
Date: August 11, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING - 09/03/2021 @ 01:30 PM
Date: August 04, 2021DEFENDANTS' EXHIBIT LIST
Date: July 13, 2021STIPULATION ON CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER
Date: May 11, 2021RESPONSE - PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS EXPERT INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 25, 2021ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTIN FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: March 16, 2021AGREED ORDER ON CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT
Date: March 09, 2021CERTIFICATE - CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY
Date: May 14, 2021NOTICE FOR TRIAL
Date: June 23, 2021DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: November 20, 2020COURT MINUTES
Date: March 08, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - DEBRA LAPOSA - MARCH 10, 2021 @ 10 AM
Date: March 09, 2021PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: January 26, 2021DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: February 15, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF EXPERT REQUESTS TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: February 25, 2021DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF EXPERT INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: February 25, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION STEPHEN M. LAPOSA 1/29/2021 @ 1:00 PM
Date: January 08, 2021STIPULATION OF CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER
Date: February 23, 2021SECOND NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - STEPEH LAPOSA
Date: February 23, 2021NOTICE OF MEDIATION - 5/19/2021 @ 11:00AM
Date: February 17, 2021DEFENDANTS WALMART STORES EAST LPS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 17, 2021PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: July 03, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DEBRA LAPOSA 1/29/2021 @ 10:00 AM
Date: January 08, 2021VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE - SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED 1/16/2021 STEPHEN M. LAPOSA
Date: January 21, 2021PLAINTIFF'S DISCLOSURE OF FACT WITNESSES
Date: September 16, 2020DEFENDANTS' DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES
Date: October 27, 2020REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: September 11, 2020PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF FACTS AND ISSUES
Date: August 19, 2020DEFENDANTS' FACT WITNESS DISCLOSURE
Date: October 13, 2020DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: May 27, 2021SUMMONS
Date: May 25, 2021CERTIFICATE - CHARLOTTE COUNTY, FLORIDA CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY
Date: June 17, 2021AGREED ORDER ON CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT
Date: May 17, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION MAY 19, 2021 @11:00 AM
Date: May 18, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE - SECOND SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED 3/4/2021 STEPHEN M LAPOSA
Date: March 05, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - STEPHEN M LAPOSA - MARCH 10, 2021 @ 1 PM
Date: March 09, 2021SECOND NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - DEBRA LAPOSA
Date: February 23, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: May 18, 2021AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER
Date: June 04, 2020AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: May 15, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE - SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED 7/31/2020 FLORIDA EAR AND SINUS CENTER
Date: August 06, 2020NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 03, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: June 03, 2020REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: May 28, 2020DEFENDANT WALMART STORES EAST LP'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 09, 2020DEFENDANT, WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P.'S CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION
Date: July 27, 2020DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: May 18, 2020OPINION AND ORDER
Date: May 15, 2020PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: June 18, 2020CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 31, 2020DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: March 19, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 09, 2020DEFENDANT WALMART STORES EAST L.P.'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 09, 2020STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES IN CHARLOTTE COUNTY
Date: January 31, 2020PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 31, 2020PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020015277
Date: February 04, 2020NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 31, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: January 31, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING - 11/08/2021 @ 09:30 AM
Date: October 06, 2021INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER
Date: November 01, 2021NOTICE OF FILING - DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF DEBRA LAPOSA AND DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF STEVEN LAPOSA
Date: September 23, 2021MOTION FOR SUMMARY - DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 23, 2021EXHIBIT LIST - DEFENDANT
Date: September 07, 2021ORDER
Date: September 03, 2021ORDER - RECORDED (O.4835.1246. / 2993676)
Date: September 03, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING - 11/08/2021 @ 09:30 AM
Date: September 28, 2021NOTICE OF FILING - DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: October 04, 2021JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO COMPLETE MEDIATION
Date: May 20, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: February 17, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING - 3/8/2021 @ 1:30PM
Date: February 01, 2021OPINION AND ORDER
Date: May 11, 2020NOTICE CANCELLING JUDICIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - MAY 2, 2022 @ 10:00 AM
Date: March 22, 2022COURT MINUTES
Date: November 01, 2021MEDIATION REPORT
Date: June 24, 20213/21/2022
Date: May 02, 202410/6/2021
Date: May 02, 202411/1/2021
Date: May 01, 202410/4/2021
Date: May 16, 20243/22/2022
Date: May 01, 20249/28/2021
Date: May 02, 20249/23/2021
Date: May 03, 19959/23/2021
Date: May 03, 2029/7/2021
Date: May 02, 20249/7/2021
Date: May 03, 20248/30/2021
Date: May 03, 20369/3/2021
Date: May 01, 20248/23/2021
Date: May 06, 20248/30/2021
Date: May 08, 20248/11/2021
Date: May 02, 20249/3/2021
Date: May 02, 20247/23/2021
Date: May 03, 20608/10/2021
Date: May 04, 20248/4/2021
Date: May 02, 20247/17/2021
Date: May 01, 20246/24/2021
Date: May 01, 20246/23/2021
Date: May 01, 20247/13/2021
Date: May 06, 20245/20/2021
Date: May 02, 20245/27/2021
Date: May 02, 20246/17/2021
Date: May 02, 20245/18/2021
Date: May 02, 20245/25/2021
Date: May 02, 20245/17/2021
Date: May 03, 20245/14/2021
Date: May 02, 20245/11/2021
Date: May 01, 20243/16/2021
Date: May 01, 20243/9/2021
Date: May 03, 20243/9/2021
Date: May 02, 20243/25/2021
Date: May 02, 20243/5/2021
Date: May 03, 20243/8/2021
Date: May 02, 20242/25/2021
Date: May 02, 20242/23/2021
Date: May 01, 20242/17/2021
Date: May 05, 20242/25/2021
Date: May 03, 20242/15/2021
Date: May 30, 20241/26/2021
Date: May 04, 20242/1/2021
Date: May 02, 20242/17/2021
Date: May 02, 20242/23/2021
Date: May 02, 20241/21/2021
Date: May 03, 202411/20/2020
Date: May 02, 20241/8/2021
Date: May 02, 20248/13/2020
Date: May 03, 202410/13/2020
Date: May 06, 202410/27/2020
Date: May 02, 20248/19/2020
Date: May 03, 20249/11/2020
Date: May 02, 20248/6/2020
Date: May 03, 20249/16/2020
Date: May 03, 20247/27/2020
Date: May 02, 20247/14/2020
Date: May 14, 20248/5/2020
Date: May 03, 20246/18/2020
Date: May 02, 20245/28/2020
Date: May 02, 20247/3/2020
Date: May 03, 20246/3/2020
Date: May 01, 20245/21/2020
Date: May 04, 20247/3/2020
Date: May 01, 20246/4/2020
Date: May 04, 20245/15/2020
Date: May 06, 20245/15/2020
Date: May 14, 20243/19/2020
Date: May 13, 20245/18/2020
Date: May 04, 20245/11/2020
Date: May 14, 20243/9/2020
Date: May 05, 20242/26/2020
Date: May 04, 20243/9/2020
Date: May 04, 20243/9/2020
Date: May 02, 20242/4/2020
Date: May 01, 20241/31/2020
Date: May 01, 20241/31/2020
Date: May 03, 20241/31/2020
Date: May 06, 20241/31/2020
Date: May 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2036 | Docket Event | ||
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 16, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 14, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 14, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 14, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.