Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Matters Involving Claims 8,001 - 15,000 case against Andersen, Exton, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with BELL, PETER A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 14, 2019 |
CategoryMatters Involving Claims 8,001 - 15,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
|
NOTICE OF HEARING - 07/20/2021 @ 01:30 PM
Date: June 11, 2021NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING
Date: June 10, 2021PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: June 10, 2021PAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #2020005611
Date: November 15, 2019ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS EX-PARTE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE
Date: November 14, 2019NOTICE TO TRANSFER TO CHARLOTTE COUNTY FROM PASCO
Date: November 14, 2019CASE HISTORY FROM PASCO COUNTY
Date: November 14, 2019ENVELOPE RETURNED UNSERVED/UNCLAIMED-EXTON ANDERSEN
Date: April 20, 20217/26/2021
Date: May 03, 20247/27/2021
Date: May 02, 20247/20/2021
Date: May 01, 20247/26/2021
Date: May 01, 20246/25/2021
Date: May 02, 20246/10/2021
Date: May 01, 20346/10/2021
Date: May 02, 20244/12/2021
Date: May 02, 20246/11/2021
Date: May 01, 202411/14/2019
Date: May 29, 20244/20/2021
Date: May 03, 202411/14/2019
Date: May 01, 202411/15/2019
Date: May 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2034 | Docket Event | ||
May 29, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.