Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Roy, Margaret, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Heisner, Adam Charles Robert, against Walmart Inc., represented by Valenti, John S, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 26, 2019 |
CategoryPremises Liability - Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
COMPLAINT
Date: March 26, 2019NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: June 10, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 26, 2019ORDER
Date: May 07, 2019PLAINTIFF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: March 26, 2019PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019024133
Date: April 01, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 26, 2019JOINT STIPULATION TO AMEND COMPLAINT THROUGH INTERLINEATION
Date: May 02, 2019STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES IN CHARLOTTE COUNTY
Date: March 26, 2019NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF ATTORNEY
Date: June 17, 20195/7/2019
Date: May 01, 20243/26/2019
Date: May 04, 20246/17/2019
Date: May 01, 20245/2/2019
Date: May 01, 20246/10/2019
Date: May 01, 20573/26/2019
Date: May 01, 20243/26/2019
Date: May 07, 20244/9/2019
Date: May 07, 20244/1/2019
Date: May 01, 20243/26/2019
Date: May 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2057 | Docket Event | ||
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.