Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Matters Involving Claims 8,001 - 15,000 case against Richard, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with BELL, PETER A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 21, 2017 |
CategoryMatters Involving Claims 8,001 - 15,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
|
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: April 05, 2019ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: June 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS
Date: June 15, 2021PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE
Date: June 21, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING 6/28/19 1:30PM
Date: June 24, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: June 21, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS
Date: June 15, 2021NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 15, 2021PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017043340
Date: August 21, 2017NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING
Date: August 21, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: August 21, 2017AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON MICHAEL RICHARD 9/21/2017 10:18AM
Date: September 25, 2017SUMMONS REQUEST/ISSUED AGAINST MICAHEL RICHARD
Date: August 21, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 21, 2017DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: August 21, 2017COURT MINUTES - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: June 28, 2019RESPONSE MICHAEL RICHARD
Date: September 27, 20176/22/2021
Date: May 01, 20246/21/2021
Date: May 01, 20246/15/2021
Date: May 03, 20246/15/2021
Date: May 01, 20246/10/2021
Date: May 01, 20246/28/2019
Date: May 01, 20244/12/2021
Date: May 02, 20246/24/2019
Date: May 01, 20244/5/2019
Date: May 01, 20556/21/2019
Date: May 01, 20243/7/2019
Date: May 02, 20249/27/2017
Date: May 02, 20249/25/2017
Date: May 03, 20246/14/2019
Date: May 01, 20248/21/2017
Date: May 03, 20248/21/2017
Date: May 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2055 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.