Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Florida Opportunity Real Estate Investment, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Solloa, H Michael Jr, against All Unknown Parties Claiming Interests By, Through, Under Or Against A Named Defendant To This Action, Or Having Or Claiming To Have Any Right, Title Or Interest In The Property Hereein Described, Milan, Wilfredo, Reigosa, Lisette, Unknown Tenant #1, Unknown Tenant #2, (total of 5) See All represented by Mack-Majka, Jacqulyn, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 27, 132 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Residential Foreclosure 50,001 - 250,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Date: August 15, 2018CERTIFICATE OF TITLE TO RECORDING
Date: August 15, 2018NOTICE OF RETAINING LIEN
Date: July 18, 2018LETTER FROM CLERK TO TRIPP SCOTT, P.A
Date: July 20, 2018CERTIFICATE OF SALE- $81,300.00- FLORIDA OPPOURTUNITY REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT
Date: July 09, 2018CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Date: July 09, 2018PAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2018038186
Date: July 09, 2018NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE - 7/9/18 - TO BE PUBLISHED IN CHARLOTTE SUN X2
Date: May 16, 2018FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE - Recorded (O.4314.408 / 2611451)
Date: May 11, 2018NOTICE OF TAKING OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: April 24, 2018AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEY FEES
Date: May 01, 2018CERTIFICATE OF TITLE BOOK 4349 PAGE 86
Date: August 20, 2018FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: May 09, 2018FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: May 09, 2018BID LOG
Date: July 09, 2018ORDER ON JUDICIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNECE (JCMC) - CMC SET FOR 05/09/18 @ 1;30PM
Date: April 12, 2018CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR CERTIFICATE OF TITLE AND CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Date: August 15, 2018ORDER ON JUDICIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 10, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING - 5/9/18 @ 1:30PM
Date: April 24, 2018ORIGINAL MORTGAGE
Date: April 13, 2018NOTICE OF FILING
Date: April 13, 2018VERIFIED MOTION TO CONTINUE MAY 9, 2017 HEARING DATE
Date: April 24, 2018COURT MINUTES
Date: May 09, 2018COURT MINUTES - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 11, 2018MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT AND ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: April 10, 2018ORIGINAL NOTE
Date: April 13, 2018REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: April 10, 2018PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 30, 2017DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Date: August 24, 2017ORDER DENYING COURT DEFAULT
Date: December 06, 2017PLAINTIFF'S REPLY AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER INVOKING THE DOCTRINE OF JUDICIAL ESTOPPEL
Date: April 09, 2018PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANTS WILFREDO MILAN AND LISSETTE REIGOSA
Date: December 07, 2017DEFENDANTS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: December 06, 2017ORDER ON JUDICIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (JCMC) - CMC SET FOR 01/10/18 @ 1:30PM
Date: December 07, 2017MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT - WILFREDO MILAN AND LISSETTE REIGOSA
Date: November 22, 2017COURT MINUTES - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: March 14, 2018NOTICE OF REVOCATION OF DEFENDANT'S AUTHORIZATION
Date: March 16, 2018ORDER ON JUDICIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (JCMC) - CMC 4/11/18 @ 1:30 PM
Date: March 16, 2018MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT
Date: August 16, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: June 28, 2017AMENDED NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: January 10, 2018NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY - JACQULYN MACK-MAJKA, ESQ.
Date: January 10, 2018ORDER ON JUDICIAL CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS (JCMC) - CMC 03/14/18 @ 1:30 PM
Date: January 12, 2018COURT MINUTES - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 10, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: January 09, 2018AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY
Date: October 17, 2017PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 30, 2017NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 22, 2017COURT MINUTES - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 06, 2017PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Date: October 30, 2017CROSS NOTICE OF HEARING - 1/10/18 @ 1:30 PM
Date: December 22, 2017ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS - DENIED
Date: October 17, 2017LETTER FROM CLERK TO TRIPP SCOTT - E-FILED DOCUMENT ACCEPTED IN ERROR
Date: October 06, 2017SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED - UNKNOWN TENANT #2
Date: August 11, 2017PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY
Date: October 06, 2017NOTICE OF HEARING - 11/1/17 @ 10:30AM
Date: August 29, 2017NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (O.4216.602 / 2536138)
Date: July 06, 2017PAYMENT $951.00 RECEIPT #2017036805
Date: July 05, 2017NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 24, 2017SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED- 07/05/17 - UNKNOWN TENANT #1
Date: June 28, 2017AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING (TO REFLECT NEW DATE ONLY) - 10/9/17 @ 1:30 PM
Date: August 31, 2017NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: August 15, 2017SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT #1 - N/K/A ABLE MILAN - 7/26/17
Date: August 11, 2017SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - LISSETTE REIGOSA - 7/26/17
Date: August 11, 2017SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED - 07/05/17 - UNKNOWN TENANT #2
Date: June 28, 2017SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED- 07/05/17 - WILFREDO MILAN
Date: June 28, 2017SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - WILFREDO MILAN - 7/26/17
Date: August 11, 2017STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: June 28, 2017SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED- 07/05/17 - LISSTTE REIGOSA
Date: June 28, 2017VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: June 28, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 28, 2017NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: June 28, 2017CLERKS MORTGAGE/NOTE WORKFLOW BATCH COVER SHEET
Date: April 13, 2018ORDER ON MOTION TO CONTINUE SUMMARY JUDGMENT - DENIED
Date: May 09, 2018ORDER ON MOTION FOR ORDER INVOKING THE DOCTRINE OF JUDICAL ESTOPPEL GRANTED
Date: May 09, 2018CURCUIT COURT MINUTES
Date: October 09, 2017ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE - GRANTED
Date: January 10, 2018LETTER FROM CLERK TO TRIPP SCOTT, P.A. - NOTICE OF SALE NOT PROVIDED
Date: May 10, 2018TRANSMITTAL FORM
Date: August 15, 2018NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVITS
Date: April 11, 20188/20/2018
Date: April 02, 20248/15/2018
Date: April 01, 20248/15/2018
Date: April 02, 20247/18/2018
Date: April 06, 20247/20/2018
Date: April 01, 20247/9/2018
Date: April 01, 20247/9/2018
Date: April 02, 20245/11/2018
Date: April 06, 20245/29/2018
Date: April 01, 20245/10/2018
Date: April 02, 20245/10/2018
Date: April 01, 20245/16/2018
Date: April 02, 20245/9/2018
Date: April 06, 20245/9/2018
Date: April 02, 20245/9/2018
Date: April 01, 20244/24/2018
Date: April 03, 20245/1/2018
Date: April 02, 20244/24/2018
Date: April 05, 20244/13/2018
Date: April 01, 20244/24/2018
Date: April 02, 20244/13/2018
Date: April 08, 20244/13/2018
Date: April 18, 20244/12/2018
Date: April 02, 20244/13/2018
Date: April 02, 20244/11/2018
Date: April 27, 20424/11/2018
Date: April 01, 20244/10/2018
Date: April 27, 20594/10/2018
Date: April 27, 19744/10/2018
Date: April 27, 19853/16/2018
Date: April 02, 20244/9/2018
Date: April 27, 20523/16/2018
Date: April 03, 20243/14/2018
Date: April 01, 20244/9/2018
Date: April 06, 20241/12/2018
Date: April 02, 20241/10/2018
Date: April 02, 20241/9/2018
Date: April 27, 1321/9/2018
Date: April 06, 202412/13/2017
Date: April 10, 202412/7/2017
Date: April 02, 20241/10/2018
Date: April 01, 202412/7/2017
Date: April 12, 202412/22/2017
Date: April 02, 202412/7/2017
Date: April 03, 202412/7/2017
Date: April 11, 202412/6/2017
Date: April 01, 202411/22/2017
Date: April 03, 202412/6/2017
Date: April 27, 205312/6/2017
Date: April 02, 202410/30/2017
Date: April 10, 202410/30/2017
Date: April 08, 202410/19/2017
Date: April 02, 202411/22/2017
Date: April 02, 202410/30/2017
Date: April 01, 202410/17/2017
Date: April 01, 202410/6/2017
Date: April 03, 202410/6/2017
Date: April 01, 20248/29/2017
Date: April 02, 202410/9/2017
Date: April 01, 20248/24/2017
Date: April 02, 20248/15/2017
Date: April 02, 20248/31/2017
Date: April 02, 20248/24/2017
Date: April 09, 20248/16/2017
Date: April 10, 20248/11/2017
Date: April 03, 20248/11/2017
Date: April 02, 20247/5/2017
Date: April 01, 20247/6/2017
Date: April 01, 20246/28/2017
Date: April 27, 20466/28/2017
Date: April 02, 20246/28/2017
Date: April 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2059 | Docket Event | ||
April 27, 2053 | Docket Event | ||
April 27, 2052 | Docket Event | ||
April 27, 2046 | Docket Event | ||
April 27, 2042 | Docket Event | ||
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.