Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gmac Mortgage, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Morgan, Clive Newlands, Swosinski, Justin, against Dececchis, Jeffrey A, Doe, Jane, Doe, John, Unknown Spouse Of Jeffrey A. Dececchis, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2016 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure 50,001 - 250,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
8/3/2018
Date: April 01, 20248/1/2018
Date: April 01, 20247/30/2018
Date: April 03, 20247/18/2018
Date: April 02, 20247/17/2018
Date: April 01, 20246/15/2018
Date: April 02, 20247/9/2018
Date: April 01, 20246/26/2017
Date: April 03, 20247/16/2018
Date: April 02, 20247/6/2018
Date: April 10, 20246/15/2017
Date: April 01, 20246/16/2017
Date: April 02, 20246/15/2017
Date: April 02, 20244/10/2017
Date: April 04, 20246/1/2017
Date: April 01, 20245/30/2017
Date: April 02, 20244/5/2017
Date: April 02, 20242/7/2017
Date: April 02, 20244/5/2017
Date: April 04, 20244/5/2017
Date: April 01, 20244/1/2017
Date: April 27, 205412/12/2016
Date: April 03, 20242/13/2017
Date: April 03, 202412/7/2016
Date: April 02, 20242/7/2017
Date: April 01, 202412/15/2016
Date: April 03, 202412/5/2016
Date: April 02, 202412/6/2016
Date: April 01, 202412/2/2016
Date: April 02, 202410/31/2016
Date: April 02, 202411/8/2016
Date: April 03, 202412/5/2016
Date: April 03, 20248/26/2016
Date: April 01, 202411/9/2016
Date: April 03, 20248/15/2016
Date: April 02, 20248/12/2016
Date: April 02, 20248/2/2016
Date: April 04, 20245/27/2016
Date: April 01, 20245/27/2016
Date: April 02, 20245/26/2016
Date: April 03, 20245/26/2016
Date: April 27, 20425/26/2016
Date: April 01, 20245/26/2016
Date: April 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2054 | Docket Event | ||
April 27, 2042 | Docket Event | ||
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.