Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
1775 Llc A Florida Limited Liability Company, Weiler Engineering Inc, A Florida Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cheffy Passidomo, Dagostino, Louis Domenico, against Charlotte County, A Political Subdivision Of The State Of Florida, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2012 |
CategoryContracts |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 30, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING FOR VARIOUS MOTIONS ON MARCH 27, 2015 @ 10:00 AM | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING FOR VARIOUS MOTIONS ON APRIL 30, 2015 @ 2:30 PM | |
March 18, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF RAYMOND H. KRASINSKI FOR RAYMOND H. KRASINSKI ON MARCH 18, 2015 AT 10:00 | |
March 18, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF MICHAEL A. CRAIN | |
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING SUMMARY OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS | |
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING - VARIOUS MATTERS - APRIL 30, 2015 @ 2:30 PM | |
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event | DFENDANT'S CHARLOTTE COUNTY, SECOND MOTION IN LIMINE | |
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT CHARLOTTE COUNTY'S EXHIBIT LIST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.