Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Financial Freedom Acquisition Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Choice Legal Group, P.A., Solomon Judah, Robertson Anschutz & Schneid Pl, against Fisher, Beth A, Lynch, Bonnie, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, Section 20 Property Owner'S Association, Inc., Shuttleworth, Thomas, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Residential Foreclosure - $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | CLERKS MORTGAGE/NOTE WORKFLOW BATCH COVER SHEET | |
September 19, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE BK 3902 PG 474 9/19/2014 | |
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT AND CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event | TRANSMITTAL FORM | |
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE TO RECORDING | |
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | BID LOG 81,100.00 ONEWEST BANK, FSB | |
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE $81,100.00 ONEWEST BANK, FSB | |
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2014043781 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.