Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na As Successor By Merger To Wachovia Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Doe, John, Unknown Spouse, Burke C Johnson, Unknown Spouse, Linda D Johnson, Johnson, Linda, Johnson, Linda D, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure - $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
April 19, 2011 | Docket Event | AMENDE FORM A | |
April 12, 2011 | Docket Event | RESCHEDULED MEDIATION NOTICE 5/2/11 9AM | |
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event | RESCHEDULED MEDIATION NOTICE 4/28/11 9AM | |
March 24, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION 4/22/11 9:00 AM | |
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BURKE C JOHNSON 1/4/11 | |
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED - JOHN DOE | |
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LINDA D JOHNSON A/K/A LINDA JOHNSON | |
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - LINDA D. JOHNSON A/K/A LINDA JOHNSON 01/04/11 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.