Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Chafin, Matthew Eric, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Arnett Chafin, Kayla Leann, in the jurisdiction of Calhoun County, FL, . Calhoun County, FL Superior Courts with YOUNG, BRANDON JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 21, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCalhoun County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED KAYLA LEANN ARNETT CHAFIN | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | SHERIFF RETURN SERVED KAYLA LEANN ARNETT CHAFIN | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING PARENT EDUCATION COURSE | |
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.