Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Castleberry, Rhonda, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Castleberry, William C, in the jurisdiction of Calhoun County, FL, . Calhoun County, FL Superior Courts with YOUNG, BRANDON JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 04, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCalhoun County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | WIFE'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER AMENDED ANSWER TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | WIFE'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR RELIEF | |
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE | |
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.