Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Elliott, Lisa Stewart, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Elliott, Wes William, in the jurisdiction of Calhoun County, FL, . Calhoun County, FL Superior Courts with YOUNG, BRANDON JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 14, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCalhoun County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT/CERTIFICATE OF DELINQUENCY | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING MEMO TO CLERK | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE THAT CAUSE IS AT ISSUE | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFAULT AGAINST WES WILLIAM ELLIOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.