Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Alday, Randi Danielle, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Alday, Jesse Allen, in the jurisdiction of Calhoun County, FL, . Calhoun County, FL Superior Courts with YOUNG, BRANDON JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2020 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCalhoun County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO CORRECT VIN NUMBERS | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO AMEND FINAL JUDGMENT | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFAULT | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK'S DEFAULT | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMENDMENT OF PLEADINGS | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ALLOW AMENDMENT OF PLEADINGS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.