Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Csmc 2019-Rpl2 Trust, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 37-D case represented by Rosaler, Brian Lee, against Marshall, Pamela M., Marshall, Rocky Allen, Unknown Tenant, in the jurisdiction of Calhoun County, FL, . Calhoun County, FL Superior Courts with KEVIN GROVER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2020 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCalhoun County, FL |
|
SUMMONS ROCKY MARSHALL
Date: February 27, 2020SUMMONS UNKNOWN TENANT
Date: February 27, 2020ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER
Date: March 09, 2020FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE (IN REM)
Date: April 16, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE ROCKY MARSHALL NOT FOUND
Date: March 20, 2020SUMMONS PAMELA M MARSHALL
Date: February 27, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF NOTICE OF SALE WAS PUBLISHED | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE-PLAINTIFF $100.00 | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ASSIGNMENT OF BID | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | PROPOSED CERT OF TITLE | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE (IN REM) | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER TO JUDICIAL ASSISTANT TO HONORABLE KEVIN GROVER FROM POPKIN & ROSALER PA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.