Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Coker, Shelby Brooke, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Medina, Yesenia, in the jurisdiction of Calhoun County, FL, . Calhoun County, FL Superior Courts with JOHNSON, DAVID P presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 21, 2019 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCalhoun County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISS OF MARRIAGE | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Report AND RECOMMENDATION ON PETITON FOR DISS OF MARRIAGE | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | BEING SET | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT-BOTH PARTIES | |
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event | CHECK LIST | |
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE | |
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING ADDRESS | |
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.