Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Brody, Elizabeth P filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Lopane, Nicholas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryPurported Will |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Discharge Signed: 12/07/2021 Judge Levenson |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Discharge (No Proposed Order) |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Inventory | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Mandated Checklist - Pet for Discharge | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement Re: Creditors | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Inventory - Estate Received | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Not to Creditors | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.