Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Associatesmd Billing And Mgmt, filed a(n) Cc Equity = $15,000 case represented by Draizin, Aaron, against Permanent General Assurance Corporation, represented by Minetree, Rachel H, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Eves, Tabitha Blackmon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2021 |
CategoryCc Equity = $15,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
This complaint is a declaratory action filed by ASSOCIATESMD BILLING AND MANAGEMENT, LLC on behalf of TINA HARRISON against PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION. The plaintiff alleges that TINA HARRISON was involved in a motor vehicle collision in...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: February 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Permanent General Assurance Corporation |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice OF IMPENDING DEFAULT |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 11-07-2022 9:00 AM |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline PROJECTED TRIAL PERIOD: 01-02-2023 to 01-31-2023 |
|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order Granting Defts mo/ext of time--20 days |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Permanent General Assurance Corporation |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Party: Defendant Permanent General Assurance Corporation |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES IN COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516Party: Defendant Permanent General Assurance Corporation |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | eSummons Issuance | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.