Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Ingino, Michael James, against Martin, Francisco, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Eves, Tabitha Blackmon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC against Francisco Martin in the County Court in Broward County, Florida. The complaint states that the plaintiff is seeking damages that exceed $8,000 but are less than $30,000. Ford Motor Cred...
eSummons Issuance - Alias
Date: August 02, 2021Summons Returned Unserved
Date: May 07, 2021Order After Show Cause Hearing -
Date: February 09, 2022Showing of Good Cause
Date: February 09, 2022Notice of Impending Dismissal
Date: January 28, 2022Alias Summons Returned Unserved
Date: November 11, 2021Pluries Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 17, 2022eSummons Issuance - Pluries
Date: February 07, 2022Exhibits
Date: February 09, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: February 08, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: February 08, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: February 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Pluries Summons Returned Unserved | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Order After Show Cause Hearing - | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Showing of Good Cause Party: Plaintiff Ford Motor Credit Company LLC |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibits PLAINTIFF'S SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance - Pluries Party: Defendant Martin, Francisco |
|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Impending Dismissal | |
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Alias Summons Returned Unserved Party: Defendant Martin, Francisco |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | eSummons Issuance - Alias | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved Party: Defendant Martin, Francisco |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | eSummons Issuance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.