Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Alvarez, Melissa, against Narvaja, Claudia Silvina, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Eves, Tabitha Blackmon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Bank of America, N.A. against Claudia Silvina Narvaja. Bank of America alleges that Narvaja breached her duty to make periodic payments on a credit account owned by the bank. As a result, the account was charged-off and the...
Non-Military Affidavit
Date: April 23, 2021Non-Military Affidavit
Date: June 02, 2021Affidavit of Costs
Date: June 02, 2021Mediation Report
Date: July 22, 2021Motion for Default & Default
Date: April 23, 2021Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing
Date: June 02, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: June 02, 2021Motion for Final Judgment of Default
Date: June 02, 2021Notice of Mediation
Date: June 04, 2021Stipulation
Date: June 10, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: February 08, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: February 25, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: February 08, 2021Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing
Date: February 08, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: February 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mediation Report (settled prior to mediation) |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Payment |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Non-Military Affidavit | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Costs | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing the Affidavit of Indebtedness in support of Plaintiffs Default Final JudgmentParty: Plaintiff Bank of America NA |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Final Judgment of Default Party: Plaintiff Bank of America NA |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit Party: Defendant Narvaja, Claudia Silvina |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Default & Default |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.