Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Progressive Express Ins. Co., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Breitner, Jordan, against Vassor, Bobby, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Francois, Phoebee presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2018 |
Category* Cc Damages >$5,000 - $15,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
This complaint is filed by Progressive Express Ins. Co. as the subrogee of Treadway Trucking Inc. against Bobby Vassor Jr. The action is for damages in the amount of $10,940.39, excluding costs and pre-judgment interest. The Plaintiff is a foreign co...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy Fee Payor: MARKCITY ROTHMAN CANTWELL ; Userid: CTS-bvolcy ; Receipt: 20183YF3M000204; ;Amount: $3.00 |
|
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certified & True Copy Issued jgmt/ recording dept |
|
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Interest | |
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Amounts Due | |
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Costs | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing RETURN RECEIPT CARD |
|
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Instructions to the Clerk | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Non-Military Affidavit | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion for Default & Default | |
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service M 4/9/18 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.