Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Florida Leak Detection And Mitigation Service, Llc, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Gioia, Robert L, against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, represented by Grossman, Tamara, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with DePrimo, Natasha presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2018 |
CategoryCc Property Insurance Claims >$5K < $15K |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Florida Leak Detection and Mitigation Service, LLC on behalf of Luis Castro and Aliria Riveros against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation. The complaint alleges that Luis Castro and Aliria Riveros were insured by the d...
Response to Request for Production
Date: February 20, 2018Notice of Settlement
Date: March 21, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 02, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 05, 2018Request to Produce
Date: January 02, 2018Response to Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Florida Leak Detection and Mitigation Service, LLC |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Privilege Log | |
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Affirmative Defenses | |
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer & Affirmative Defenses | |
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance and DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSESParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability July 1,2018 through and including July 7, 2018; August 16, 2018 through and including August 27, 2018Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint (eFiled) | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: STEPHANIE BALINT ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A000352; ;Amount: $300.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.