Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Anchor Water Damage Restoration Inc, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Mineo, Peter, Jr., against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Groelle, Robert C, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with DePrimo, Natasha presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2018 |
CategoryCc Property Insurance Claims >$5K < $15K |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Anchor Water Damage Restoration, Inc. on behalf of Gualberto Gonzalez and Milagros Gonzalez against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The complaint alleges breach of contract as the assignee of the insurance ...
Request for Production
Date: December 19, 2018Notice of Settlement
Date: December 20, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 12, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: November 28, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: November 02, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: October 02, 2018Notice of Expert Witnesses
Date: November 09, 2018Notice of Withdrawal
Date: October 03, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 18, 2018Agreed Order
Date: May 01, 2018Agreed Order
Date: May 15, 2018Response to Request to Produce
Date: May 18, 2018Motion for Protective Order
Date: March 06, 2018Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: October 11, 2018Request to Produce
Date: January 02, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 02, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: December 11, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Anchor Water Damage Restoration Inc |
|
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production OF DOCUMENTS (FIRST)Party: Defendant Universal Property and Casualty Insurance Company |
|
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions FIRSTParty: Plaintiff Anchor Water Damage Restoration Inc |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs SECOND SETParty: Plaintiff Anchor Water Damage Restoration Inc |
|
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Expert Witnesses Party: Plaintiff Anchor Water Damage Restoration Inc |
|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.