Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
South Florida Dry Out Services Llc, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Mineo, Peter, Jr., against State Farm Florida Insurance Company, represented by Kellner, Ilana Green, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with DePrimo, Natasha presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2018 |
CategoryCc Property Insurance Claims >$5K < $15K |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by South Florida Dry Out Services LLC on behalf of Annie Sapp against State Farm Florida Insurance Company. The complaint alleges breach of contract as the assignee of Annie Sapp. The plaintiff claims that Annie Sapp had a pol...
Motion to Compel
Date: April 27, 2018Request to Produce
Date: June 11, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 10, 2018Request for Production
Date: May 29, 2018Request to Produce
Date: January 02, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 02, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: June 29, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 05, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: April 09, 2018Request for Production of Documents
Date: April 25, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: July 26, 2018Answer to Interrogs
Date: July 26, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: June 29, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: July 13, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: June 29, 2018Order Setting
Date: August 06, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: July 26, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: April 25, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: April 27, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: April 27, 2018Notice of Settlement
Date: October 25, 2018Response
Date: October 15, 2018Interrogatories
Date: September 20, 2018Request for Production
Date: September 20, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: September 25, 2018Motion
Date: October 11, 2018Joint Stipulation
Date: November 15, 2018Notice of Settlement
Date: October 25, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: September 13, 2018Request for Production
Date: September 24, 2018Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: September 15, 2018Expert Witness List
Date: September 20, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Joint Stipulation FOR FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff South Florida Dry Out Services LLC |
|
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Defendant State Farm Florida Insurance Company |
|
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response In Opposition to df's mot for sumary JgmtParty: Plaintiff South Florida Dry Out Services LLC |
|
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion TO EXTEND PRETRIALParty: Defendant State Farm Florida Insurance Company |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Production |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.