Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Cc Credit Card Debt >$5K < $15K case represented by Winter, Robert A, against Beatty, Gwynne, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Levine, Olga presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLevine, Olga Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 21, 2017 |
CategoryCc Credit Card Debt >$5K < $15K |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Bank of America, N.A. against Gwynne Beatty. Bank of America is seeking damages from Beatty for breaching their duty by failing to make periodic payments on a credit account. The entire balance on the account, which is $12,...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: August 21, 2017Motion to Appear Telephonically
Date: April 26, 2018Order Granting
Date: May 01, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Final Judgment BY DEFAULTParty: Plaintiff Bank of America NA |
|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit of IndebtednessParty: Plaintiff Bank of America NA |
|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Costs Party: Plaintiff Bank of America NA |
|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Non-Military Affidavit | |
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing Party: Plaintiff Bank of America NA |
|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion to Appear by Telephone |
|
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Appear Telephonically Party: Plaintiff Bank of America NA |
|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default Party: Defendant Beatty, Gwynne |
|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Non-Military Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.