Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Barclays Bank Delaware, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Weiss, Sara L, against Matatof, Eric T, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Francois, Phoebee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrancois, Phoebee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
Category* Cc Damages >$5,000 - $15,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Order Granting Motion
Date: May 08, 2013Order Of Recusal
Date: January 09, 2014Motion to Appear Telephonically
Date: June 14, 2013Motion
Date: July 11, 2013Order Granting Motion
Date: June 28, 2013Order Granting Motion
Date: May 08, 2013Response
Date: April 04, 2013Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: April 22, 2013Response to Request to Produce
Date: April 10, 2013Order Granting Motion
Date: August 20, 2013Motion for Continuance
Date: August 20, 2013Answer to Complaint
Date: April 24, 2013Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 30, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy Fee Payor: MARCADIS SINGER PA ; Userid: CTS-mcorsaro ; Receipt: 20143YF3A000148; ;Amount: $3.00 |
|
February 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Suggestion of Bankruptcy case #14-11973-RBR |
|
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Of Recusal | |
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Costs | |
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Non-Military Affidavit | |
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion for Continuance s 8/7/13 |
|
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance | |
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Exhibits | |
July 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion TO RE-SCHEDULE HRG (FAX COPY)Party: Defendant Matatof, Eric T |
|
July 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Re-Notice of Hearing August 8, 2013 @ 9:30am rm 210 -trial on damages |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.