Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Winding Lake At Welleby Condo Assn Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Levin, Cheryl J, Esq., against Wells Fargo Bank Na, Limerick, Lisa A, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with DePrimo, Natasha presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2012 |
Category* Foreclosure + - Foreclosure =$5000 |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lack of Prosecution 8/23/13 @ 9 am room 220 |
|
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons Returned Served | |
August 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default Party: Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA |
|
May 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 05-04-12Party: Defendant Wells Fargo Bank NA |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: LEVIN ESQ, CHERYL J ; Userid: CTS-kgalloway ; Receipt: 20123YF3D001497; ;Amount: $300.00 |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued to Process Server -wells fargo Bank NA |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: LEVIN ESQ, CHERYL J ; Userid: CTS-kgalloway ; Receipt: 20123YF3D001497; ;Amount: $20.00 |
|
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lis Pendens Fld & Rec |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.