Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Lucoff, Joel D, against Palma, Deyvi, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Miller, Terri-Ann presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
Category* Cc Damages >$5,000 - $15,000 |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing FAILURE TO PROSECUTE |
|
July 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Order EX-PARTE ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO INITIAL AND SUPPLEMENTAL DISOVERY (7/8/15) |
|
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER INVOKING FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE | |
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Court Order/Trial Set 9/19/14 at 10:30am |
|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Appearance At Pretrial & ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (7-21-14) |
|
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service NON-SERVEDParty: Defendant PALMA, DEYVI |
|
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: JOSEPH F ROSEN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20141FA1A000023; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: JOSEPH F ROSEN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20141FA1A000023; ;Amount: $300.00 |
|
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint (eFiled) | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | eSummons Issuance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.